Search This Blog

Loading...

Toughest Series Puzzle

Toughest Series Puzzle - 12 September

What is the next number in this series?

4,12,84,3612....

For Solution : Click Here

19 comments:

  1. 62,4867 may be the solution..

    ReplyDelete
  2. 4 12 42 3612 6526884 21300113901612

    ReplyDelete
  3. 4, 4*(6/2), 12*(14/2), 84*(86/2), 3612*(3614/2).....
    i.e.
    4, 12, 84, 3612, 6526884......

    ReplyDelete
  4. 6541332.
    4*(prime just greater than 4/2 )=12
    similarly 12*7=84
    84*43=3612
    3612*1811=6541332

    ReplyDelete
  5. (12*12)/2+12=84
    (84*84)/2+84=3612
    (3612*3612)/2+3612=6526884

    ReplyDelete
  6. I got right answer..The answer is 6526884..It is very simple.
    It is something like this
    4*3=12
    12*((12+2)/2))=84
    84*((84+2)/2))=3412
    3412*((3412+2)/2)=6526884
    I hope you have got it..

    ReplyDelete
  7. 4 12 84 3612

    4 * 2 = 8
    4 * 1 = 4

    84 is the third number

    Again
    12 * 3 =36
    12 * 1=12

    3612 Fourth number

    In the same way

    84 * 4=336
    84 * 1=84

    33684

    Multiples of 21 ,31 ,41 n son on

    ReplyDelete
  8. It could also be solved as:-

    4,12,84,3612,(1556772)

    let us see how.

    4*3=12
    12*[3*(2)+1]=84
    84*[7*(6)+1]=3612
    3612*[43*(10)+1]=1556772

    The pattern may be difficult to recognise hence I state it as 2,6,10 being the constant multiplier of previous successor term.
    (Shrohan Mohapatra,Bhubaneswar,Odisha)

    ReplyDelete
  9. 4x3 = 12
    12x7 = 84 (12 is last no. and 3x3-2=7)
    84x43 = 3612 (84 is last no. and 7x7-6 = 43)
    next no:
    3612x(43x43-42)=6526884

    ReplyDelete
  10. next num = num*(num/2+1)
    4 x((4/2)+1) =4 x 3 =12
    12 x((12/2+1) =12 x 7 =84
    84 x((84/2)+1) =84 x 43 =3612
    3612 x((3612/2)+1)
    = 3612 x 1807 =6526884

    ReplyDelete
    Replies
    1. 4,12,84,3612......
      ANS :-
      2*2 , 2*2*3, 2*2*3*7, 2*2*3*7*43,......
      as you can easily notice that the product of previous terms are repeating...
      now, we can deduce a series from it for ease
      i.e.
      1,3,7,43....
      By solving this,
      ((2nd term * 1st term) *2) +1
      by this,
      (3*1)*2 +1 = 7
      similarly
      (7*3)*2 +1 = 43
      so,
      (43*7)*2+1 = 602

      Now the complete series answer is
      2*2*3*7*43*602= 2174424

      Delete