**Algebra Maths Equation Riddle - 24 May**

Can you solve the below algebraic mathematical equation?

(J+O+I+N+T)3 = JOINT

**For Solution :**Click Here

This Blog is a collection of brain teasers, puzzles (maths,fun,brain etc), riddles,Questions, Quiz.

Can you solve the below algebraic mathematical equation?

(J+O+I+N+T)3 = JOINT

Subscribe to:
Post Comments (Atom)

Difficulty Level 3/5
(798)
Logic Puzzles
(526)
Difficulty Level 4/5
(523)
Picture Puzzles
(381)
Maths Puzzles
(368)
Riddles
(368)
Difficulty Level 2/5
(360)
Trick Teasers
(299)
Popular Puzzles
(230)
Rebus Puzzles
(168)
Humor Puzzles
(160)
Series Puzzles
(136)
Interview Puzzle
(131)
What Word Am I
(103)
Difficulty Level 1/5
(90)
Equation Puzzles
(83)
Trivia
(79)
Mystery Puzzles
(76)
Difficulty level 5/5
(58)
Who Am I
(58)
Murder Mystery Puzzles
(45)
Algebra
(40)
Probability Puzzles
(40)
Square Count
(40)
Cipher Puzzles
(36)
IAS-EXAMS
(34)
Science Puzzles
(34)
MatchSticks-Riddles
(28)
Situation Puzzles
(28)
Puzzles of Age
(22)
statement
(19)
Google Interview Puzzle
(18)
Read Between Lines Puzzles
(18)
Microsoft Interview Puzzles
(16)
Odd One Out
(15)
Time Distance Problem
(14)
Relationship Puzzles
(12)
Cards
(11)
Story Puzzles
(11)
Paradox Puzzles
(9)
Classic
(6)
Directional Puzzles
(6)
Best Of 2011
(5)
clever
(5)
Analytical
(4)
Brain-Twister
(4)
Mind Games
(4)
chess
(4)
What Does This Text Mean
(3)
CHALLENGING
(2)
Double Meaning
(2)
Acronym
(1)
Measure
(1)
Suduko
(1)
Video Riddle
(1)
coin-Puzzles
(1)
m
(1)
pop
(1)
triv
(1)

(J+O+I+N+T)3=(J+O+I+N+T)cube

ReplyDelete17576

ReplyDelete(1+7+5+7+6)^3=17576

well my answer to that was more logical than other things.

ReplyDelete(j+o+i+n+t)3= JOINT

lets say : j+o+i+n+t = Y

Means that if we add those numbers potency 3 = 5 digits

Using calculator you realise that the number 22 is the first potency 3 has 5 digits.

22*22*22=10648

the last number is 46

46*46*46= 97336

so we know that the total of the numbers is between 22 and 46.

we will check the minimum / maximum sum of five numbers ( j+o+i+n+t)

if we do 1+2+3+4+5 = 15 ( not possible as between 22 and 46)

2+3+4+5+6= 20 not possible as between 22 and 46.

3+4+5+6+7= 25 possible, now we know its between 25 and 46

The maximum will be : 9+8+7+6+5= 35 this max so the sum is between 25 and 35.

Using calculator you just have to do 25*25*25= 15'625 not good one as number five is shown twice

26*26*26= 15 756 not good one as number five as well is shown more than one time

27*27*27= 19 683 this could be used as total of 1+9+6+8+3= 27

28*28*28= 21 952 not good one as number two is shown twice

29*29*29= 24 389 this could be used however their sum isnt 29

32*32*32= 32 768 this could be used however their sum isnt 32

Hop dat helpd lil bit, as said its more logical than mathematical.